NM HB303 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 117 - Apr. 6
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 117 - Apr. 6
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Unlawful Liquor License Inducements
Title
Unlawful Liquor License Inducements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-18 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-05 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-05 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-18 | House | Signed by Governor - Chapter 117 - Apr. 6 |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:37 N:3 |
2021-03-14 | Senate | STBTC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Sent to STBTC - Referrals: STBTC |
2021-03-05 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:49 N:15 |
2021-02-25 | House | HCEDC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2021-02-18 | House | Sent to HCEDC - Referrals: HCEDC |