NM HB300 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-19 - STBTC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-19 - STBTC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
State Leadership Pilot Program
Title
State Leadership Pilot Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-10 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-19 | Senate | STBTC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Sent to STBTC - Referrals: STBTC |
2021-03-10 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:49 N:18 |
2021-03-08 | House | Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2021-03-05 | House | HSEIC: Reported by committee with Do Not Pass but with a Do Pass recommendation on Committee Substitution |
2021-02-18 | House | Sent to HSEIC - Referrals: HSEIC/HAFC |