NM HB299 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-11 - Sent to SJC - Referrals: SJC
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-11 - Sent to SJC - Referrals: SJC
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Improvement Special Assessment Act
Title
Improvement Special Assessment Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-10 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-11 | Senate | Sent to SJC - Referrals: SJC |
2021-03-10 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:42 N:26 |
2021-03-10 | House | multiple floor amendments |
2021-03-05 | House | HTRC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2021-03-02 | House | HLLC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2021-02-18 | House | Sent to HLLC - Referrals: HLLC/HTRC |