NM HB296 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on March 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-26 - [LD 48] Passed Senate (35-6) Vetoed by the Governor and date.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on March 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-26 - [LD 48] Passed Senate (35-6) Vetoed by the Governor and date.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Solar energy installation lease tax credit
Title
Solar energy installation lease tax credit
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-20 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-26 | Senate | [LD 48] Passed Senate (35-6) Vetoed by the Governor and date. |
2015-03-17 | Senate | [LD 41] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2015-03-13 | Senate | [LD 39] Referred to Senate Finance |
2015-03-13 | Senate | [LD 39] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-03-02 | Senate | [LD 30] Referred to Senate Corporations & Transportation |
2015-03-02 | Senate | [LD 30] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-02-25 | Senate | [LD 27] Referred to Senate Conservation |
2015-02-25 | Senate | [LD 27] Assigned to Senate Conservation and then to Senate Corporations & Transportation and then to Senate Finance |
2015-02-25 | House | [LD 27] Passed House (63-0) |
2015-02-25 | House | [LD 27] Floor amendment adopted |
2015-02-17 | House | [LD 21] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-02-10 | House | [LD 16] HWMC |
2015-02-10 | House | [LD 16] Referred to House Appropriations & Finance Assigned to Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2015-01-30 | House | [LD 9] HWMC |
2015-01-30 | House | [LD 9] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-01-26 | House | [LD 5] HEENC |
2015-01-26 | House | [LD 5] HEENC and then to HWMC and then to House Appropriations & Finance |