NM HB295 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-03 - Action Postponed Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-03 - Action Postponed Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Health Security Act
Title
Health Security Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-03 | House | Action Postponed Indefinitely |
2019-03-03 | House | Referred to: HAFC |
2019-03-03 | House | w/drn h/calendar- re |
2019-03-03 | House | House of Representatives Floor Amendment |
2019-02-28 | House | Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2019-02-25 | House | HSEIC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2019-02-08 | House | HHHC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-01-21 | House | Sent to HHHC - Referrals: HHHC/HSEIC/HAFC |
New Mexico State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.nmlegis.gov/lcs/legislation.aspx?chamber=H&legtype=B&legno=295&year=19 |
Text | https://www.nmlegis.gov/Sessions/19%20Regular/bills/house/HB0295.pdf |