NM HB291 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-13 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 202 - Apr. 3
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-13 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 202 - Apr. 3
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Efficient Use Of Energy Act Changes
Title
Efficient Use Of Energy Act Changes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-13 | House | Signed by Governor - Chapter 202 - Apr. 3 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:27 N:13 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | SCORC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Sent to SCORC - Referrals: SCORC |
2019-03-05 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:58 N:7 |
2019-03-03 | House | HSEIC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2019-02-22 | House | Referred to: HSEIC |
2019-02-22 | House | Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2019-02-04 | House | HENRC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2019-01-21 | House | Sent to HENRC - Referrals: HENRC/HJC |