NM HB289 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Vetoed on February 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-17 - [LD 32] Passed Senate (38-0) Vetoed by the Governor and date.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on February 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-17 - [LD 32] Passed Senate (38-0) Vetoed by the Governor and date.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Agriculture In Econ Development Finance Act
Title
Agriculture In Econ Development Finance Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-16 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-17 | Senate | [LD 32] Passed Senate (38-0) Vetoed by the Governor and date. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | [LD 31] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-02-11 | Senate | [LD 26] Referred to Senate Corporations & Transportation |
2017-02-11 | Senate | [LD 26] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-02-07 | Senate | [LD 22] Referred to Senate Conservation |
2017-02-07 | Senate | [LD 22] Assigned to Senate Conservation and then to Senate Corporations & Transportation |
2017-01-26 | House | [LD 10] Passed House (59-1) |
2017-01-24 | House | [LD 8] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-01-21 | House | [LD 5] Referred to House Business & Industry |
2017-01-21 | House | [LD 5] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2017-01-20 | House | [LD 4] HLEDC |
2017-01-20 | House | [LD 4] HLEDC and then to House Business & Industry |