NM HB280 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-13 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 129 - Apr. 2
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-13 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 129 - Apr. 2
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Nurse & Midwife Privilege Parity
Title
Nurse & Midwife Privilege Parity
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-13 | House | Signed by Governor - Chapter 129 - Apr. 2 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:36 N:5 |
2019-03-09 | Senate | SJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-03-02 | Senate | SPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Sent to SPAC - Referrals: SPAC/SJC |
2019-02-21 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:44 N:17 |
2019-02-21 | House | House of Representatives Floor Amendment |
2019-02-14 | House | HCEDC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-02-04 | House | HHHC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-01-21 | House | Sent to HHHC - Referrals: HHHC/HCEDC |