NM HB28 | 2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-28 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 11 - Feb. 28
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Public Project Revolving Fund Projects

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Project Revolving Fund Projects

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-02-13 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-02-28HouseSigned by Governor - Chapter 11 - Feb. 28
2024-02-13SenatePassed in the Senate - Y:40 N:0
2024-02-11SenateSFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
2024-02-09SenateSent to SFC - Referrals: SFC
2024-02-08HousePassed in the House of Representatives - Y:65 N:0
2024-02-06HouseHAFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s)
2024-01-26HouseHTPWC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
2024-01-23HouseSent to HTPWC - Referrals: HTPWC/HAFC
2024-01-23HouseWithdrawn from committee or daily calendar, ordered printed and referred to
2024-01-16HouseNot Printed
2024-01-16HouseSent to HPREF - Referrals: HPREF

New Mexico State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback