NM HB278 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-17 - Action Postponed Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-17 - Action Postponed Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Health Insurance Tax & New Fund
Title
Health Insurance Tax & New Fund
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-16 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-17 | Senate | Action Postponed Indefinitely |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Sent to SFC - Referrals: SFC |
2020-02-17 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:41 N:25 |
2020-02-12 | House | HTRC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2020-02-06 | House | HHHC: Reported by committee with Do Not Pass but with a Do Pass recommendation on Committee Substitution |
2020-01-29 | House | Sent to HHHC - Referrals: HHHC/HTRC |