NM HB278 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-03 - [LD 16] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-03 - [LD 16] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Public Pension Forfeiture Act
Title
Public Pension Forfeiture Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-03 | House | [LD 16] Action postponed indefinitely |
2016-02-03 | House | [LD 16] Committee substitute and then to Do pass committee report adopted |
2016-02-03 | House | [LD 16] Do not pass committee report adopted |
2016-01-30 | House | [LD 12] Referred to House Judiciary |
2016-01-30 | House | [LD 12] Committee substitute and then to Do pass committee report adopted |
2016-01-30 | House | [LD 12] Do not pass committee report adopted |
2016-01-25 | House | [LD 7] Referred to House Safety & Civil Affairs |
2016-01-25 | House | [LD 7] Assigned to House Safety & Civil Affairs and then to House Judiciary |
2016-01-25 | House | [LD 7] Assigned to |
2016-01-25 | House | [LD 7] Printed |
2016-01-25 | House | [LD 7] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2016-01-22 | House | [LD 4] Referred to House Rules & Order of Business |
2016-01-22 | House | [LD 4] Not Printed |