NM HB277 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-14 - [LD 19] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-14 - [LD 19] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
State Defense Force Changes
Title
State Defense Force Changes
Sponsors
Rep. David Adkins [R] | Rep. Gail Armstrong [R] | Rep. Cathrynn Brown [R] | Rep. Sharon Clahchischilliage [R] |
Rep. Yvette Herrell [R] | Rep. James Townsend [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-12 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-14 | Senate | [LD 19] Action postponed indefinitely |
2018-02-14 | Senate | [LD 19] Do pass committee report adopted |
2018-02-13 | Senate | [LD 18] Referred to Senate Rules |
2018-02-13 | Senate | [LD 18] Referred to Senate Rules |
2018-02-12 | House | [LD 8] Passed House (66-0) |
2018-02-12 | House | [LD 8] Do pass committee report adopted |
2018-02-12 | House | [LD 8] Referred to House Judiciary |
2018-02-12 | House | [LD 8] Do pass committee report adopted |
2018-02-01 | House | [LD 4] HSIVC |
2018-02-01 | House | [LD 4] Assigned to HSIVC and then to House Judiciary |
2018-02-01 | House | [LD 4] Printed |
2018-02-01 | House | [LD 4] Ruled germane to bills which fall within the purview of a 30-day session |
2018-02-01 | House | [LD 4] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2018-01-30 | House | [LD 3] Referred to House Rules & Order of Business |
2018-01-30 | House | [LD 3] Not Printed |