NM HB275 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 14-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-12 - STBTC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-12 - STBTC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Fallen Officer Signage On Highways
Title
Fallen Officer Signage On Highways
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-01 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-12 | Senate | STBTC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Sent to STBTC - Referrals: STBTC |
2021-03-01 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:68 N:0 |
2021-03-01 | House | Floor substitute adopted |
2021-02-25 | House | HTPWC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2021-02-11 | House | Sent to HTPWC - Referrals: HTPWC |