NM HB275 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-13 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 193 - Apr. 3
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-13 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 193 - Apr. 3
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
College Of Education Affordability
Title
College Of Education Affordability
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-09 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-13 | House | Signed by Governor - Chapter 193 - Apr. 3 |
2019-03-13 | House | House has concurred with Senate Amendments |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:38 N:0 |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment |
2019-03-06 | Senate | SEC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Sent to SEC - Referrals: SEC |
2019-02-28 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:64 N:0 |
2019-02-26 | House | HAFC: Reported by committee with Do Not Pass but with a Do Pass recommendation on Committee Substitution |
2019-02-01 | House | HEC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-01-17 | House | Sent to HEC - Referrals: HEC/HAFC |