NM HB272 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-16 - [LD 40] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-16 - [LD 40] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Transportation network company services act
Title
Transportation network company services act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-12 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 8 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-16 | Senate | [LD 40] Action postponed indefinitely |
2015-03-16 | Senate | [LD 40] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2015-03-16 | Senate | [LD 40] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-03-13 | Senate | [LD 39] Referred to Senate Corporations & Transportation |
2015-03-13 | Senate | [LD 39] Assigned to Senate Corporations & Transportation and then to Senate Judiciary |
2015-03-09 | House | [LD 35] Passed House (56-8) |
2015-02-27 | House | [LD 29] Committee substitute and then to Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-02-27 | House | [LD 29] Do not pass committee report adopted |
2015-02-19 | House | [LD 23] Referred to House Regulatory & Public Affairs |
2015-02-19 | House | [LD 23] Committee substitute and then to Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-02-19 | House | [LD 23] Do not pass committee report adopted |
2015-01-23 | House | [LD 4] Referred to House Transportation & Public Works |
2015-01-23 | House | [LD 4] Assigned to House Transportation & Public Works and then to HRPAC |