NM HB27 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 17 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-02-17 - Passed in the Senate - Y:40 N:0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Public Project Revolving Fund Projects

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Project Revolving Fund Projects

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-17SenatePassed in the Senate - Y:40 N:0
2020-02-13SenateSFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
2020-02-11SenateSent to SFC - Referrals: SFC
2020-02-11HousePassed in the House of Representatives - Y:64 N:0
2020-02-07HouseHAFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s)
2020-01-22HouseSent to HAFC - Referrals: HAFC
2020-01-21HouseSent to HPREF - Referrals: HPREF

New Mexico State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback