NM HB268 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-11 - Sent to SJC - Referrals: SJC
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-11 - Sent to SJC - Referrals: SJC
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Coronavirus & Workers' Comp
Title
Coronavirus & Workers' Comp
Sponsors
Rep. Christine Chandler [D] | Rep. Meredith Dixon [D] | Rep. Daymon Ely [D] | Rep. Joy Garratt [D] |
Rep. Dayan Hochman-Vigil [D] | Rep. Patricia Roybal Caballero [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-08 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-11 | Senate | Sent to SJC - Referrals: SJC |
2021-03-08 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:38 N:27 |
2021-03-08 | House | House of Representatives Floor Amendment |
2021-03-01 | House | HSEIC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2021-02-19 | House | HLVMC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2021-02-09 | House | Sent to HLVMC - Referrals: HLVMC/HSEIC |