NM HB266 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-09 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 62 - Mar. 15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-09 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 62 - Mar. 15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Forest & Watershed Restoration Act
Title
Forest & Watershed Restoration Act
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Bandy [R] | Sen. Peter Wirth [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-09 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-24 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-02-24 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-09 | House | Signed by Governor - Chapter 62 - Mar. 15 |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:38 N:0 |
2019-03-09 | Senate | SFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-03-05 | Senate | SCONC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Sent to SCONC - Referrals: SCONC/SFC |
2019-02-24 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:62 N:0 |
2019-02-22 | House | HAFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2019-02-14 | House | Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2019-01-31 | House | Referred to: HSEIC/HAFC |
2019-01-30 | House | HENRC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-01-17 | House | Sent to HENRC - Referrals: HENRC/HSEIC |