NM HB262 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-15 - Action Postponed Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-15 - Action Postponed Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Publication Of Capital Outlay Info
Title
Publication Of Capital Outlay Info
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-01 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-15 | Senate | Action Postponed Indefinitely |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2019-03-12 | Senate | SRC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Sent to SRC - Referrals: SRC/SFC |
2019-02-01 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:68 N:0 |
2019-01-23 | House | HJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-01-17 | House | Sent to HJC - Referrals: HJC |