NM HB260 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-04 - SCONC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-04 - SCONC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Park Passes For Vets & Gold Star Families
Title
Park Passes For Vets & Gold Star Families
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-23 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-04 | Senate | SCONC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Sent to SCONC - Referrals: SCONC/SFC |
2021-02-23 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:68 N:0 |
2021-02-16 | House | HLVMC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2021-02-04 | House | Sent to HLVMC - Referrals: HLVMC |