NM HB26 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-01 - Action Postponed Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-01 - Action Postponed Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Fees For Public Documents
Title
Fees For Public Documents
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-27 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-01 | Senate | Action Postponed Indefinitely |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Sent to SJC - Referrals: SJC |
2019-02-27 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:49 N:9 |
2019-02-25 | House | HSEIC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-02-13 | House | Sent to HSEIC - Referrals: HSEIC |