NM HB26 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-02 - [LD 16] SPAC/SJC-SPAC API.
Pending: Senate Public Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-02 - [LD 16] SPAC/SJC-SPAC API.
Pending: Senate Public Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibit intimidation of judges & retaliation
Title
Prohibit intimidation of judges & retaliation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-02 | [LD 16] SPAC/SJC-SPAC API. | |
2011-02-07 | [LD 21] PASSED/H (64-1) | |
2011-02-05 | [LD 19] DNP-CS/DP | |
2011-01-28 | [LD 11] DP-HJC | |
2011-01-19 | [LD 2] HCPAC/HJC-HCPAC | |
2011-01-18 | [LD 1] HPREF |