NM HB259 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-17 - Action Postponed Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Homeowner Association Foreclosures

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Homeowner Association Foreclosures

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-17 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-17SenateAction Postponed Indefinitely
2020-02-17SenateSent to SJC - Referrals: SJC
2020-02-17HousePassed in the House of Representatives - Y:45 N:25
2020-02-13HouseHJC: Reported by committee with Do Not Pass but with a Do Pass recommendation on Committee Substitution
2020-02-04HouseHLLC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
2020-01-30HouseReferred to: HLLC/HJC
2020-01-30HousePrinted
2020-01-30HouseWithdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action
2020-01-27HouseNot Printed

New Mexico State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback