NM HB256 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-17 - [LD 32] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 29
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-17 - [LD 32] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 29
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Drinking Water System Financing
Title
Drinking Water System Financing
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-16 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-17 | House | [LD 32] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 29 |
2017-02-17 | Senate | [LD 32] Passed Senate (39-0) |
2017-02-16 | Senate | [LD 31] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-02-11 | Senate | [LD 26] Referred to Senate Finance |
2017-02-11 | Senate | [LD 26] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-02-05 | Senate | [LD 20] Referred to Senate Conservation |
2017-02-05 | Senate | [LD 20] Assigned to Senate Conservation and then to Senate Finance |
2017-01-25 | House | [LD 9] Passed House (63-0) |
2017-01-23 | House | [LD 7] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-01-20 | House | [LD 4] Referred to House Appropriations & Finance |
2017-01-20 | House | [LD 4] Referred to House Appropriations & Finance |