NM HB252 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-10 - [LD 23] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 58
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-10 - [LD 23] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 58
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Remove Federal Conflict In Motor Carrier Law
Title
Remove Federal Conflict In Motor Carrier Law
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-18 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House Final Passage (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House Final Passage (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-10 | House | [LD 23] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 58 |
2016-02-10 | Senate | [LD 23] Passed Senate (39-0) |
2016-02-09 | Senate | [LD 22] Do pass committee report adopted |
2016-02-05 | Senate | [LD 18] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2016-02-02 | House | [LD 15] Passed House (65-0) |
2016-01-31 | House | [LD 13] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2016-01-29 | House | [LD 11] Referred to House Judiciary |
2016-01-29 | House | [LD 11] Do pass committee report adopted |
2016-01-26 | House | [LD 8] Referred to House Transportation & Public Works |
2016-01-26 | House | [LD 8] Assigned to House Transportation & Public Works and then to House Judiciary |
2016-01-26 | House | [LD 8] Assigned to |
2016-01-26 | House | [LD 8] Printed |
2016-01-26 | House | [LD 8] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2016-01-21 | House | [LD 3] Referred to House Rules & Order of Business |
2016-01-21 | House | [LD 3] Not Printed |