NM HB251 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-27 - Action Postponed Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-27 - Action Postponed Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Higher Education Coordinating Council
Title
Higher Education Coordinating Council
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-26 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-27 | Senate | Action Postponed Indefinitely |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Sent to SEC - Referrals: SEC/SFC |
2019-02-26 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:67 N:0 |
2019-02-22 | House | Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2019-02-22 | House | HSEIC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2019-02-01 | House | HEC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-01-17 | House | Sent to HEC - Referrals: HEC/HSEIC/HJC |