NM HB251 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-10 - [LD 17] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-10 - [LD 17] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
County Behavioral Health Transportation Fund
Title
County Behavioral Health Transportation Fund
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-09 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-10 | Senate | [LD 17] Action postponed indefinitely |
2018-02-10 | Senate | [LD 17] Referred to Senate Finance |
2018-02-10 | Senate | [LD 17] Referred to Senate Finance |
2018-02-08 | House | [LD 6] Passed House (68-0) |
2018-02-08 | House | [LD 6] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2018-02-06 | House | [LD 5] Referred to House Appropriations & Finance |
2018-02-06 | House | [LD 5] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2018-01-26 | House | [LD 3] HHouse Health |
2018-01-26 | House | [LD 3] HHouse Health and then to House Appropriations & Finance |