NM HB249 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-15 - [LD 44] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-15 - [LD 44] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Developmental disabilities service targets
Title
Developmental disabilities service targets
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-20 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-15 | Senate | [LD 44] Action postponed indefinitely |
2013-03-15 | Senate | [LD 44] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-03-15 | Senate | [LD 44] Referred to Senate Finance |
2013-03-15 | Senate | [LD 44] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-02-12 | Senate | [LD 21] Referred to Senate Public Affairs |
2013-02-12 | Senate | [LD 21] Assigned to Senate Public Affairs and then to Senate Finance |
2013-02-22 | House | [LD 29] Passed House (66-0) |
2013-02-19 | House | [LD 26] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-01-23 | House | [LD 7] Referred to House Health, Government & Indian Affairs |