NM HB248 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-17 - STBTC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-17 - STBTC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Insurance Fee Changes
Title
Insurance Fee Changes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-09 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-17 | Senate | STBTC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Sent to STBTC - Referrals: STBTC |
2021-03-09 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:41 N:28 |
2021-03-03 | House | HTRC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2021-02-18 | House | Referred to: HTRC |
2021-02-18 | House | Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2021-02-16 | House | HCEDC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2021-02-04 | House | Sent to HCEDC - Referrals: HCEDC/HJC |