NM HB240 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 14 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-03-14 - Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

"contracting Hospital" Definition

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

"contracting Hospital" Definition

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-14 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-14HouseVetoed by Governor
2021-03-14SenatePassed in the Senate - Y:41 N:0
2021-03-13SenateSTBTC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
2021-03-02SenateSent to STBTC - Referrals: STBTC
2021-02-25HousePassed in the House of Representatives - Y:67 N:0
2021-02-25HouseHouse of Representatives Floor Amendment
2021-02-22HouseHHHC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s)
2021-02-02HouseSent to HHHC - Referrals: HHHC

New Mexico State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback