NM HB238 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on March 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-16 - Pocket Veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on March 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-16 - Pocket Veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Fire Protection Grant Fund Changes
Title
Fire Protection Grant Fund Changes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-16 | House | Pocket Veto |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:40 N:0 |
2021-03-14 | Senate | SFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Sent to SFC - Referrals: SFC |
2021-03-02 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:69 N:0 |
2021-03-01 | House | HAFC: Reported by committee with Do Not Pass but with a Do Pass recommendation on Committee Substitution |
2021-02-02 | House | Sent to HAFC - Referrals: HAFC |