NM HB234 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-16 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 272 - Apr. 4
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Public Service Officers & Detox Facilities

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Service Officers & Detox Facilities

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-16 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-24 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-16HouseSigned by Governor - Chapter 272 - Apr. 4
2019-03-16SenatePassed in the Senate - Y:37 N:0
2019-03-16SenateWithdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action
2019-03-08SenateSPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
2019-02-25SenateSent to SPAC - Referrals: SPAC/SJC
2019-02-24HousePassed in the House of Representatives - Y:67 N:0
2019-02-21HouseHJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s)
2019-02-04HouseHHHC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
2019-01-17HouseSent to HHHC - Referrals: HHHC/HJC

New Mexico State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback