NM HB232 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-30 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 67 - Mar. 30
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-30 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 67 - Mar. 30
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Disclosure Of Certain Info
Title
Disclosure Of Certain Info
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-14 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-30 | House | Signed by Governor - Chapter 67 - Mar. 30 |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:37 N:0 |
2023-03-11 | Senate | SHPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Sent to SHPAC - Referrals: SHPAC |
2023-03-09 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:46 N:19 |
2023-03-07 | House | HJC: Reported by committee with Do Not Pass but with a Do Pass recommendation on Committee Substitution |
2023-02-13 | House | HCPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2023-01-30 | House | Sent to HCPAC - Referrals: HCPAC/HJC |