NM HB229 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-17 - SRC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Election Laws Cleanup

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Election Laws Cleanup

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-15 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-17SenateSRC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
2020-02-15SenateSent to SRC - Referrals: SRC
2020-02-15HousePassed in the House of Representatives - Y:46 N:17
2020-02-13HouseHJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s)
2020-02-06HouseHSEIC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s)
2020-01-30HouseReferred to: HSEIC/HJC
2020-01-30HousePrinted
2020-01-30HouseWithdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action
2020-01-24HouseNot Printed

New Mexico State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback