NM HB229 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on January 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-31 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 13 - Feb. 4
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on January 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-31 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 13 - Feb. 4
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Regional Air Center Special Economic District
Title
Regional Air Center Special Economic District
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 64 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 64 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-31 | House | Signed by Governor - Chapter 13 - Feb. 4 |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:37 N:3 |
2019-01-29 | Senate | SJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Sent to SJC - Referrals: SJC |
2019-01-23 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:64 N:4 |
2019-01-22 | House | HJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2019-01-17 | House | Sent to HJC - Referrals: HJC |
2019-01-15 | House | Sent to HPREF - Referrals: HPREF |