NM HB228 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-05 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 150 - Apr. 5
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-05 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 150 - Apr. 5
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Improvement Special Assessment Act
Title
Improvement Special Assessment Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-17 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-05 | House | Signed by Governor - Chapter 150 - Apr. 5 |
2023-03-17 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:35 N:3 |
2023-03-16 | Senate | SJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2023-03-12 | Senate | STBTC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Sent to STBTC - Referrals: STBTC/SJC |
2023-02-28 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:44 N:18 |
2023-02-24 | House | HGEIC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2023-02-14 | House | HCEDC: Reported by committee with Do Not Pass but with a Do Pass recommendation on Committee Substitution |
2023-01-30 | House | Sent to HCEDC - Referrals: HCEDC/HGEIC |