NM HB221 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-11 - Action Postponed Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-11 - Action Postponed Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Home Energy Efficiency Income Tax Credit
Title
Home Energy Efficiency Income Tax Credit
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-10 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-11 | Senate | Action Postponed Indefinitely |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Sent to SFC - Referrals: SFC |
2019-03-10 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:48 N:14 |
2019-03-07 | House | HTRC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-01-31 | House | HENRC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2019-01-17 | House | Sent to HENRC - Referrals: HENRC/HTRC |
2019-01-15 | House | Sent to HPREF - Referrals: HPREF |