NM HB217 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-10 - SEC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Public Health Emergency Lottery Scholarships

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Health Emergency Lottery Scholarships

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-04 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-10SenateSEC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
2021-03-05SenateSent to SEC - Referrals: SEC
2021-03-04HousePassed in the House of Representatives - Y:67 N:0
2021-03-01HouseHSEIC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s)
2021-02-16HouseHEC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
2021-02-02HouseSent to HEC - Referrals: HEC/HSEIC

New Mexico State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback