NM HB217 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Enrolled on February 20 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - Action Postponed Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on February 20 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - Action Postponed Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Electric Vehicle Income Tax Credit
Title
Electric Vehicle Income Tax Credit
Sponsors
Rep. Micaela Cadena [D] | Rep. Javier Martinez [D] | Rep. Marian Matthews [D] | Rep. Jim Trujillo [D] |
Sen. Pat Woods [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 23 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-20 | House | Action Postponed Indefinitely |
2020-02-20 | House | House has failed to concur in Senate Amendments on a House Bill |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:23 N:13 |
2020-02-20 | Senate | SFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2020-02-15 | Senate | Sent to SFC - Referrals: SFC |
2020-02-14 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:40 N:27 |
2020-02-14 | House | House of Representatives Floor Amendment |
2020-02-14 | House | Floor substitute adopted |
2020-02-12 | House | HTRC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2020-02-03 | House | HENRC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2020-01-24 | House | Sent to HENRC - Referrals: HENRC/HTRC |