NM HB215 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-08 - Sent to SJC - Referrals: SJC
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-08 - Sent to SJC - Referrals: SJC
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Behavioral Health Screening Coverage
Title
Behavioral Health Screening Coverage
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-06 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-08 | Senate | Sent to SJC - Referrals: SJC |
2021-03-06 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:61 N:4 |
2021-03-04 | House | HJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2021-02-18 | House | HHHC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2021-02-02 | House | Sent to HHHC - Referrals: HHHC/HJC |