NM HB211 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-14 - [LD 19] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-14 - [LD 19] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Line of duty injury act
Title
Line of duty injury act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-10 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 56 N: 4 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-14 | Senate | [LD 19] Action postponed indefinitely |
2014-02-14 | Senate | [LD 19] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2014-02-04 | Senate | [LD 11] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2014-02-04 | Senate | [LD 11] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2014-02-03 | Senate | [LD 10] Referred to Senate Public Affairs |
2014-02-03 | Senate | [LD 10] Assigned to Senate Public Affairs and then to Senate Judiciary |
2014-02-06 | House | [LD 13] Passed House (56-4) |
2014-02-06 | House | [LD 13] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2014-02-04 | House | [LD 11] Referred to House Appropriations & Finance |
2014-02-04 | House | [LD 11] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2014-01-28 | House | [LD 6] Referred to House Labor & Human Resources |
2014-01-28 | House | [LD 6] Assigned to House Labor & Human Resources and then to House Appropriations & Finance |