NM HB2 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-20 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 83 - Mar. 11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

General Appropriation Act Of 2020

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

General Appropriation Act Of 2020

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-20HouseSigned by Governor - Chapter 83 - Mar. 11
2020-02-20HouseHouse has concurred with Senate Amendments
2020-02-19SenatePassed in the Senate - Y:35 N:7
2020-02-18SenateSFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s)
2020-02-06SenateSent to SFC - Referrals: SFC
2020-02-05HousePassed in the House of Representatives - Y:46 N:24
2020-02-03HouseHAFC: Reported by committee with Do Not Pass but with a Do Pass recommendation on Committee Substitution
2020-01-22HouseSent to HAFC - Referrals: HAFC

New Mexico State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback