NM HB2 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-09 - [LD 16] PASSED/S (25-17) API.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-09 - [LD 16] PASSED/S (25-17) API.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
General appropriation act of 2010
Title
General appropriation act of 2010
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-09 | [LD 16] PASSED/S (25-17) API. | |
2010-02-08 | [LD 15] DP/a | |
2010-01-28 | [LD 8] SFC | |
2010-02-04 | [LD 13] PASSED/H (43-25) | |
2010-02-01 | [LD 10] DNP-CS/DP | |
2010-01-19 | [LD 1] HAFC |