NM HB199 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-19 - Action Postponed Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-19 - Action Postponed Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Study Biliteracy Frameworks
Title
Study Biliteracy Frameworks
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-15 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-19 | Senate | Action Postponed Indefinitely |
2020-02-19 | Senate | SEC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2020-02-15 | Senate | Sent to SEC - Referrals: SEC |
2020-02-15 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:67 N:0 |
2020-02-12 | House | HAFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2020-02-03 | House | HEC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2020-01-24 | House | Sent to HEC - Referrals: HEC/HAFC |