NM HB198 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-05 - Sent to SFC - Referrals: SFC
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-05 - Sent to SFC - Referrals: SFC
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Transfer Certain Dps Duties To Dot
Title
Transfer Certain Dps Duties To Dot
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-04 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-05 | Senate | Sent to SFC - Referrals: SFC |
2021-03-04 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:66 N:0 |
2021-03-01 | House | HSEIC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2021-02-19 | House | HTPWC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2021-01-28 | House | Sent to HTPWC - Referrals: HTPWC/HSEIC |