NM HB194 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-14 - [LD 19] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 56
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-14 - [LD 19] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 56
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Alternative Evidence For Tax Deductions
Title
Alternative Evidence For Tax Deductions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-14 | House | [LD 19] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 56 |
2018-02-14 | Senate | [LD 19] Passed Senate (38-0) |
2018-02-13 | Senate | [LD 18] Do pass committee report adopted |
2018-02-10 | Senate | [LD 15] Referred to Senate Finance |
2018-02-10 | Senate | [LD 15] Do pass committee report adopted |
2018-02-06 | Senate | [LD 12] Referred to Senate Corporations & Transportation |
2018-02-06 | Senate | [LD 12] Assigned to Senate Corporations & Transportation and then to Senate Finance |
2018-02-05 | House | [LD 5] Passed House (67-0) |
2018-01-31 | House | [LD 4] Committee substitute and then to Do pass committee report adopted |
2018-01-31 | House | [LD 4] Do not pass committee report adopted |
2018-01-24 | House | [LD 2] Referred to House Taxation & Revenue |
2018-01-24 | House | [LD 2] Referred to House Taxation & Revenue |