NM HB193 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-19 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 30 - Mar. 4
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-19 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 30 - Mar. 4
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Permanent Tax Distribution To Aviation Fund
Title
Permanent Tax Distribution To Aviation Fund
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-19 | House | Signed by Governor - Chapter 30 - Mar. 4 |
2020-02-19 | House | House has concurred with Senate Amendments |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:42 N:0 |
2020-02-17 | Senate | SFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Sent to SFC - Referrals: SFC |
2020-02-12 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:66 N:0 |
2020-02-08 | House | HTRC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2020-02-05 | House | HTPWC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2020-01-24 | House | Sent to HTPWC - Referrals: HTPWC/HTRC |