NM HB191 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-03 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 39 - Mar. 3
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-03 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 39 - Mar. 3
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Professional & Occupational Licensure Changes
Title
Professional & Occupational Licensure Changes
Sponsors
Rep. Gail Armstrong [R] | Rep. Rebecca Dow [R] | Rep. Doreen Gallegos [D] | Rep. Dayan Hochman-Vigil [D] |
Sen. Daniel Ivey-Soto [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-16 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-12 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-02-12 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-03 | House | Signed by Governor - Chapter 39 - Mar. 3 |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:37 N:0 |
2022-02-14 | Senate | SHPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2022-02-12 | Senate | Sent to SHPAC - Referrals: SHPAC |
2022-02-12 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:63 N:0 |
2022-02-12 | House | House of Representatives Floor Amendment |
2022-02-10 | House | HGEIC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2022-02-07 | House | HCEDC: Reported by committee with Do Not Pass but with a Do Pass recommendation on Committee Substitution |
2022-02-01 | House | Sent to HCEDC - Referrals: HCEDC/HGEIC |