NM HB188 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 102 - Apr. 6
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 102 - Apr. 6
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Secondary Computer Science Teacher License
Title
Secondary Computer Science Teacher License
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-18 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-06 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-06 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-18 | House | Signed by Governor - Chapter 102 - Apr. 6 |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:36 N:0 |
2021-03-15 | Senate | SEC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Sent to SEC - Referrals: SEC |
2021-03-06 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:65 N:0 |
2021-03-02 | House | HAFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2021-02-09 | House | HEC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2021-01-28 | House | Sent to HEC - Referrals: HEC/HAFC |