NM HB187 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on February 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-04 - [LD 17] Passed Senate (41-0) Vetoed by the Governor and date.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on February 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-04 - [LD 17] Passed Senate (41-0) Vetoed by the Governor and date.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Alternative Level 3-b School Licensure
Title
Alternative Level 3-b School Licensure
Sponsors
Rep. Dennis Roch [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-02-14 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Final Passage (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
House - House Final Passage (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-04 | Senate | [LD 17] Passed Senate (41-0) Vetoed by the Governor and date. |
2016-02-03 | Senate | [LD 16] Do pass committee report adopted |
2016-02-02 | Senate | [LD 15] Referred to Senate Education |
2016-01-29 | House | [LD 11] Passed House (66-0) |
2016-01-27 | House | [LD 9] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2016-01-24 | House | [LD 6] Referred to House Education |
2016-01-24 | House | [LD 6] Assigned to |
2016-01-24 | House | [LD 6] Printed |
2016-01-24 | House | [LD 6] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2016-01-20 | House | [LD 2] Referred to House Rules & Order of Business |
2016-01-20 | House | [LD 2] Not Printed |